- Created by @MavericK

- Tagged in :
- CAT

Hi,

I would like to add one more shortcut to Maverick's quite old but very useful post.

Here it is:

Multiplication of just over and just under numbers

97*104

97 -3

104 4

101 -12

100 88 (subtract 1 from the result of cross addition. take the complement of the right

multiplication)

Ans: 10088

103*96

103 3

96 -4

99 -12

9888

cheers!:)

Good one... no wonder u r @ iimb

- 2 Likes

Hats off!!! for information and your effort/....I am having a copt of it..i m inspired to give a full read after seeing this

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

International Management Institute, New Delhi

IMI-Delhi, ranked 9th by Business Today Survey 2014 and accredited with prestigious AMBA, SAQs and NBA, among various other accreditations; is inviting applications for PGDM, PGDHRM and PGDM-B&I for 2015-17 Batch.

Know more about Admissions 2015.

Download Now!MavericK SaysUploaded the software for the Same stuff :)

Thanks,maverick for the software...

i ll try that

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

great work man. u have really done a fabulous job. Good. Carry on. Hope to see more from you.

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

wonderful!! i had seen the book in a book stall and had by heartsd most of the multi methods from thr itself .. din't want to buy cos o already am an exp in veedic stuff.. but this post is comprehensive and precludes the need for the book. thanks a lot!! by the way, the multi methods r better than vedic too.. amazing

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

Gr8 job guys...keep going,

regards,

phani.

regards,

phani.

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

Great job Buddy!!!!!!!!!

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

only one word mav

excellent

excellent

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

similarly for nos below hundred..

ex: 96*98

96 -4

98 -2

94 08

the ans is 9408

ex: 96*98

96 -4

98 -2

94 08

the ans is 9408

- 1 Like

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

i was searching for this for a long time....keep it up bro.

Sourabh

Sourabh

- 1 Like

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

Hi,

I would like to add one more shortcut to Maverick's quite old but very useful post.

Here it is:

**Multiplication of just over and just under numbers**

97*104

97 -3

104 4

101 -12

100 88 (subtract 1 from the result of cross addition. take the complement of the right

multiplication)

Ans: 10088

103*96

103 3

96 -4

99 -12

9888

cheers!:)

I would like to add one more shortcut to Maverick's quite old but very useful post.

Here it is:

97*104

97 -3

104 4

101 -12

100 88 (subtract 1 from the result of cross addition. take the complement of the right

multiplication)

Ans: 10088

103*96

103 3

96 -4

99 -12

9888

cheers!:)

- 3 Likes

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

Hey Maverick

Thats certainly great work mann..... You took a lot of effort in writing that long post..... But its seems to be exactly same as given in the book which is titled "The Trachtenberg System on Speed Maths" the book with a black cover.... Compared to Vedic Maths I found it much better to comprehend...... Probably PGitess could refer it for some more mind boggling calc shortcuts. A discussion on the book here would uncover some more easier methods of calculating.......

What say?

Govi...........

Thats certainly great work mann..... You took a lot of effort in writing that long post..... But its seems to be exactly same as given in the book which is titled "The Trachtenberg System on Speed Maths" the book with a black cover.... Compared to Vedic Maths I found it much better to comprehend...... Probably PGitess could refer it for some more mind boggling calc shortcuts. A discussion on the book here would uncover some more easier methods of calculating.......

What say?

Govi...........

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

ur adding method consumes lot of time...

9421 + 3114 + 1382 i wud do it this way...

first all thousands...

9 + 3 + 1 = 13*1000=13000

then all hundreds

4 +1 + 3 = 8 * 100= 800

tens ...

2+1+8= 11*10=110

units...

7

adding up 13917...

such additions can be done by observation which further inc speed. with practice this can be done in less than 10 secs.

9421 + 3114 + 1382 i wud do it this way...

first all thousands...

9 + 3 + 1 = 13*1000=13000

then all hundreds

4 +1 + 3 = 8 * 100= 800

tens ...

2+1+8= 11*10=110

units...

7

adding up 13917...

such additions can be done by observation which further inc speed. with practice this can be done in less than 10 secs.

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

that was xcellent work buddy.. but one hitch regd the software... it shows that help files r missing ...gives an error ...and only allows practice problems...

just one week to go...so i hope my brain digests this stuff quick...

just one week to go...so i hope my brain digests this stuff quick...

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

hey anil,

thanks a lot man!!! how on earth could you collect so much info within such a short time. you are incredibly fast yaar .kudos!!!

guyz i think this could be the s/w which could enable us(prospective CAT 2004 ) aspirants to have a cutting edge.lets rock it guyz!!!

cheers,

Prashanth

thanks a lot man!!! how on earth could you collect so much info within such a short time. you are incredibly fast yaar .kudos!!!

guyz i think this could be the s/w which could enable us(prospective CAT 2004 ) aspirants to have a cutting edge.lets rock it guyz!!!

cheers,

Prashanth

- 1 Like

Commenting on this post has been disabled.

When you follow a discussion, you receive notifications about new posts and comments. You can unfollow a discussion anytime, or turn off notifications for it.

18 people follow this discussion.
0Commentsnew comments